WA SB6494 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding state board of health rules that impact school districts.
Title
Regarding state board of health rules that impact school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 6:00 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |