WA SB6483 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a competitive grant program to provide additional classroom space to support all-day kindergarten.
Title
Creating a competitive grant program to provide additional classroom space to support all-day kindergarten.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:30 PM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |