WA SB6473 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing fires in rental dwelling units.
Title
Preventing fires in rental dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2864 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.