WA SB6470 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the burdens of proof required in dependency matters affecting Indian children.
Title
Addressing the burdens of proof required in dependency matters affecting Indian children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 288, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |