WA SB6469 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Filling vacancies on the racial disproportionality advisory committee.
Title
Filling vacancies on the racial disproportionality advisory committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Randolph I. Gordon [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |