WA SB6444 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 5/4/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Effective date 5/4/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2010 operating supplemental appropriations.
Title
Making 2010 operating supplemental appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Effective date 5/4/2010. | |
2010-05-04 | Chapter 37, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session PV. | |
2010-05-04 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-12 | President signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed final passage; yeas, 25; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-04-12 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-16 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-28 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-27 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2824 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.