WA SB6440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning industrial insurance medical examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning industrial insurance medical examinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateEffective date 6/11/2020*.
2020-03-27SenateChapter 213, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-29HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2020-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-14SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-14Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-07SenateOn motion, referred to Rules.
2020-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB2689 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6440&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6440.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6440-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6440-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6440-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6440-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121595&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6440&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121595&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6440&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121595&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6440&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback