WA SB6435 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the building code council to adopt rules for installing outlets to charge vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the building code council to adopt rules for installing outlets to charge vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-02-26 Senate Rules "X" file.
2010-02-12 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-02-02 Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
2010-02-01 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-02-01 LCCP - Majority; do pass.
2010-01-28 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM.
2010-01-25 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM.
2010-01-14 First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback