WA SB6419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementation of the recommendations of the December 2019 report from the William D. Ruckelshaus center regarding residential habilitation center clients.
Title
Concerning implementation of the recommendations of the December 2019 report from the William D. Ruckelshaus center regarding residential habilitation center clients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 317, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2572 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.