WA SB6413 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the use of certain toxic chemicals in firefighting activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the use of certain toxic chemicals in firefighting activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 286, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-05SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27HouseCommittee amendment
2018-02-22HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-20HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment
2018-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-10SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-10Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Energy, Environment & Technology.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateEENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB2793 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6413&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6413.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6413-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6413-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6413-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6413-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6413&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-10-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6413&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=6413&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2018

Bill Comments

feedback