WA HB2793 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the use of certain toxic chemicals in firefighting activities.
Title
Reducing the use of certain toxic chemicals in firefighting activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB6413 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.