WA SB6409 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington investment in excellence account.
Title
Creating the Washington investment in excellence account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-04-23 | Chapter 27, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session PV. | |
2010-04-23 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-04-12 | President signed. | |
2010-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-16 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-10 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-10 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-06 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-24 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-03 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-03 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-03 | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |