WA SB6406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning firearms.
Title
Concerning firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |