WA SB6393 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning cannabis industry workplace standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning cannabis industry workplace standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2020-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB2361 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback