WA SB6379 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove a recorded restrictive covenant from land owned by the local government. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove, vacate, or extinguish certain covenants from land it owns. )
Title
Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove a recorded restrictive covenant from land owned by the local government. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Requiring a public hearing before a local government may remove, vacate, or extinguish certain covenants from land it owns. )
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Held on third reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2674 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.