WA SB6360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving transition planning for students in special education who meet criteria for services from the developmental disabilities administration.
Title
Improving transition planning for students in special education who meet criteria for services from the developmental disabilities administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:45 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |