WA SB6347 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the property tax exemption for new and rehabilitated multiple-unit dwellings in urban centers.
Title
Expanding the property tax exemption for new and rehabilitated multiple-unit dwellings in urban centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | EDIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development & International Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. |