WA SB6341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the liquor and cannabis board to provide written interpretations of liquor statutes and rules.
Title
Requiring the liquor and cannabis board to provide written interpretations of liquor statutes and rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2510 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6341&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6341.pdf |