WA SB6334 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementation of mandatory provisions of the federal rule on flexibility, efficiency, and modernization in child support enforcement programs regarding health care coverage.
Title
Concerning implementation of mandatory provisions of the federal rule on flexibility, efficiency, and modernization in child support enforcement programs regarding health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018*. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chapter 150, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.