WA SB6334 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing unemployment benefits when a person voluntarily terminates employment.
Title
Addressing unemployment benefits when a person voluntarily terminates employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Joe McDermott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |