WA SB6333 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax statute clarifications, simplifications, and technical corrections.
Title
Concerning tax statute clarifications, simplifications, and technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 97, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |