WA SB6305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a defined contribution retirement plan option for elected officials.
Title
Creating a defined contribution retirement plan option for elected officials.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] |
Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |