WA SB6303 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing tax incentives to encourage energy storage system and component parts manufacturing in Washington.
Title
Providing tax incentives to encourage energy storage system and component parts manufacturing in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 89 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |