WA SB6292 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the reduction in state basic education funding that occurs in counties with federal forest lands.
Title
Eliminating the reduction in state basic education funding that occurs in counties with federal forest lands.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |