WA SB6284 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing water-sewer districts from prohibiting multipurpose fire sprinkler systems.
Title
Preventing water-sewer districts from prohibiting multipurpose fire sprinkler systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage notwithstanding Governor's Veto (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's Veto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's Veto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 14, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-29 | House | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 88; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 40; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-24 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2503 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.