WA SB6273 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning insurance coverage of the sales tax for prescribed durable medical equipment and mobility enhancing equipment.
Title
Concerning insurance coverage of the sales tax for prescribed durable medical equipment and mobility enhancing equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Val Stevens [R] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 44, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-08 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2673 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.