WA SB6243 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of "oil" or "oils."
Title
Modifying the definition of "oil" or "oils."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2440 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6243&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6243.pdf |