WA SB6236 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the presentation of claims for payment for pathology services to direct patient-provider primary care practices.
Title
Authorizing the presentation of claims for payment for pathology services to direct patient-provider primary care practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-16 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2306 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6236&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6236.pdf |