WA SB6230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Title
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2610 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.