WA HB2610 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Title
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6230 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.