WA SB6212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 10/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 10/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of counties, cities, and towns to exceed statutory property tax limitations for the purpose of financing affordable housing for very low-income households and low-income households.
Title
Concerning the authority of counties, cities, and towns to exceed statutory property tax limitations for the purpose of financing affordable housing for very low-income households and low-income households.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 10/1/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 253, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to Finance.