WA SB6211 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 3/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective date 3/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the federal lands revolving account. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning the fish and wildlife federal lands revolving account and the natural resources federal lands revolving account. )
Title
Concerning the federal lands revolving account. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning the fish and wildlife federal lands revolving account and the natural resources federal lands revolving account. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 3/23/2018. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 258, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-09 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-09 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |