WA SB6210 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying procedures for obtaining an order for refund of property taxes.
Title
Simplifying procedures for obtaining an order for refund of property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2446 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6210&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6210.pdf |