WA SB6209 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing moneys paid to county road funds to be used for park and ride lots.
Title
Allowing moneys paid to county road funds to be used for park and ride lots.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 43, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-04 | President signed. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-20 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |