WA SB6187 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the electrification of transportation.
Title
Concerning the electrification of transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | TED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-03-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | EENT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |