WA SB6174 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of medications that a public or private school employee may administer to include topical medication, eye drops, and ear drops.
Title
Expanding the types of medications that a public or private school employee may administer to include topical medication, eye drops, and ear drops.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] |
Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-13 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2247 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-07 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6174&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6174.pdf |