WA SB6168 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing drainage ditches from the definition of fish and wildlife habitat conservation areas in chapter 36.70A RCW.
Title
Removing drainage ditches from the definition of fish and wildlife habitat conservation areas in chapter 36.70A RCW.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6168&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6168.pdf |