WA SB6168 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning review of licensing and employment decisions by the children's administration.
Title
Concerning review of licensing and employment decisions by the children's administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |