WA SB6164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM in anticipation of other legislative action.
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 3:30 pm in House Committee on Public Safety
Hearing: Feb 27 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning prosecutorial discretion to seek resentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning prosecutorial discretion to seek resentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM in anticipation of other legislative action.
2020-02-25HouseScheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM in anticipation of other legislative action.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-30SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback