WA SB6150 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the comprehensive plan revision schedule for select local governments.
Title
Extending the comprehensive plan revision schedule for select local governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2296 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - Effective date 6/6/2024.