WA SB6147 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a procedure for the state's retrocession of civil and criminal jurisdiction over Indian tribes and Indian country.
Title
Creating a procedure for the state's retrocession of civil and criminal jurisdiction over Indian tribes and Indian country.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Sen. Margarita Prentice [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2012-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2012-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2012-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-03 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2012.