WA SB6141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding access to higher education.
Title
Expanding access to higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 307, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2523 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.