WA SB6140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the efficient and effective management of state-managed lands.
Title
Promoting the efficient and effective management of state-managed lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2018-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |