WA SB6129 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing cities, towns, code cities, and counties to choose to conduct district-based elections.
Title
Allowing cities, towns, code cities, and counties to choose to conduct district-based elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 1:00 PM. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6129&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6129.pdf |