WA SB6127 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to human immunodeficiency virus postexposure prophylaxis drugs or therapies.
Title
Increasing access to human immunodeficiency virus postexposure prophylaxis drugs or therapies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2025. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 251, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 41 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |