WA SB6121 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the surcharge to fund biotoxin testing and monitoring.
Title
Regarding the surcharge to fund biotoxin testing and monitoring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 7/1/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 577, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-25 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:30 AM. | |
2009-04-22 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-19 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-19 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |