WA SB6115 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning residential custody services for tribal youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning residential custody services for tribal youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-09SenateChapter 31, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-09SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-20HouseCDHT - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs
2018-02-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-01-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-10SenateHSC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2373 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback