WA SB6111 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prevailing wage sanctions, penalties, and debarment.
Title
Concerning prevailing wage sanctions, penalties, and debarment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2136 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - Effective date 1/1/2026.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 12 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |