WA HB2136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Effective date 1/1/2026.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Effective date 1/1/2026.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prevailing wage sanctions, penalties, and debarment.
Title
Concerning prevailing wage sanctions, penalties, and debarment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Effective date 1/1/2026. |
2024-03-07 | House | Chapter 7, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6111 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 12 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |