WA SB6109 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ferries.
Title
Concerning ferries.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | Senate refers bill from Rules to Transportation. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-13 | Held on second reading. | |
2009-04-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-04-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |